LA HB219 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the application for federal student aid with respect to the Taylor Opportunity Program for Students (TOPS) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the application for federal student aid with respect to the Taylor Opportunity Program for Students (TOPS) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-15 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2023. |
2023-05-09 | House | Notice given. |
2023-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2023. |
2023-05-03 | House | Notice given. |
2023-05-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2023. |
2023-04-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2023-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |