LA HB214 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals individual income, corporate income, and corporate franchise taxes and repeals all credits, deductions, exemptions, and exclusions from the taxes (OR DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Repeals individual income, corporate income, and corporate franchise taxes and repeals all credits, deductions, exemptions, and exclusions from the taxes (OR DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |