LA HB207 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: House Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: House Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the payment of certain costs and fees by the office of workers' compensation administration in workers' compensation insurance proceedings
Title
Provides with respect to the payment of certain costs and fees by the office of workers' compensation administration in workers' compensation insurance proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |
2012-02-24 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2012. | |
2012-02-23 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |
2012-02-23 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB207 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=773239 |