LA HB205 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the definition of the crime of racketeering (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the definition of the crime of racketeering (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Glorioso [R] | Rep. Tony Bacala [R] | Rep. Chad Boyer [R] | Rep. Vincent Cox [R] |
Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] | Rep. Francis Thompson [R] | Rep. Debbie Villio [R] |
Rep. Jeff Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 205 FINAL PASSAGE (#183) (Y: 86 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported with amendments (9-4). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |