LA HB204 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the delivery of Medicaid-funded services for persons with disabilities (EG1 +$292,964 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the delivery of Medicaid-funded services for persons with disabilities (EG1 +$292,964 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#275) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |