LA HB203 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Prohibits the levy of tax on net incomes and provides for state taxes on the assessed value of property (OR DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Prohibits the levy of tax on net incomes and provides for state taxes on the assessed value of property (OR DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |