LA HB199 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Language Equality and Acquisition for Deaf Kids (LEAD-K) Task Force to develop framework for assessing children who are deaf or hard of hearing to determine language skills and ensure kindergarten readiness (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates Language Equality and Acquisition for Deaf Kids (LEAD-K) Task Force to develop framework for assessing children who are deaf or hard of hearing to determine language skills and ensure kindergarten readiness (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Patricia Smith [D]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]
Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]
Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]
Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]
Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Jeff Hall [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Lowell Hazel [R]
Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Frank Howard [R]Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]
Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]
Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Walt Leger [D]
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]
Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]
Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Dan Claitor [R]Sen. Jack Donahue [R]
Sen. James Fannin [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]
Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]
Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]
Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 199 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1018) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 199 CO-AUTHORS (#738) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#737) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#198) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseEffective date: See Act.
2018-05-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 455.
2018-05-17HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-14HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-14HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/14/18.
2018-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-07SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-02SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-01SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-30SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-02HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-03-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/02/18.
2018-03-28HouseNotice given.
2018-03-28HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-03-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18.
2018-03-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-21HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB199&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1068627
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077745
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081711
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096379
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101812
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073790
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077302
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077591
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077967
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078569
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090614
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092394
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094980
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096333
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1068636
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074993
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077953
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078518
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081800
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083347
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090643
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098705
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081663
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093751
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093753

Bill Comments

feedback