LA HB197 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the crime of unauthorized entry of a critical infrastructure (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the crime of unauthorized entry of a critical infrastructure (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 197 FINAL PASSAGE (#525) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 197 FINAL PASSAGE (#357) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-14SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read. (See 2020 1ES journal for Veto Message)
2020-06-12HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2020-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 8. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
2020-02-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB197&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158744
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174187
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175528
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177710
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174234
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158765
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1165416
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174416
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174851
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175557
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175771
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178181
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181944
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185728
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175456
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177507

Bill Comments

feedback