LA HB190 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes a nepotism exception for certain health professionals in a parish with a population of between four hundred thousand and four hundred forty thousand
Title
Removes a nepotism exception for certain health professionals in a parish with a population of between four hundred thousand and four hundred forty thousand
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-05-14 | House | Notice removed |
2014-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2014. |
2014-05-12 | House | Notice given. |
2014-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2014. |
2014-04-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-23 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-21 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014. |
2014-02-17 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-17 | House | Prefiled. |