LA HB19 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain payments from minimum foundation program formula funds to the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (OR NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Requires certain payments from minimum foundation program formula funds to the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (OR NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2019-02-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019. |
2019-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |