LA HB188 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in John J. Hainkel, Jr. Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in John J. Hainkel, Jr. Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local elected school board members to meet certain criteria prior to qualifying
Title
Requires local elected school board members to meet certain criteria prior to qualifying
Sponsors
Rep. John Wyble [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 188 FINAL PASSAGE (#340) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 188 FINAL PASSAGE (#340) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 188 FINAL PASSAGE (#340) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2024. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |