LA HB186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Becomes HB 698.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Becomes HB 698.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for state agency partnerships to improve Medicaid administration and program integrity (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for state agency partnerships to improve Medicaid administration and program integrity (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Becomes HB 698. |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported by substitute (14-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-24 | House | Prefiled. |