LA HB18 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the calculation of final average compensation for members of the Registrars of Voters Employees' Retirement System (EG NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Provides relative to the calculation of final average compensation for members of the Registrars of Voters Employees' Retirement System (EG NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 18 FINAL PASSAGE (#584) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18. |
2018-04-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2018-01-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018. |
2018-01-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2018-01-25 | House | Prefiled. |