LA HB179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: 06/06/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: 06/06/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Caddo Parish Fire District No. 3 to levy and collect a sales and use tax (EN +$623,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes Caddo Parish Fire District No. 3 to levy and collect a sales and use tax (EN +$623,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 179 FINAL PASSAGE (#868) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 179 FINAL PASSAGE (#170) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 179 FINAL PASSAGE (#170) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Effective date: 06/06/2019. |
2019-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 149. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2019-03-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2019-03-26 | House | Prefiled. |