LA HB170 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to reporting of students identified as having dyslexia (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to reporting of students identified as having dyslexia (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 170 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#885) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 170 FINAL PASSAGE (#523) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 170 FINAL PASSAGE (#208) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 419.
2021-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-05-27HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2021.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-24SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-20SenateReported with amendments.
2021-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably (8-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
2021-03-23HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB170&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1205663
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218288
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220825
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230301
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235920
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219245
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226686
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226555
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1205674
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212457
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218586
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218842
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220949
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221601
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229561
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231108
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237945
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220775
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228584
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230208

Bill Comments

feedback