LA HB140 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to proof of disability requirements for an airport parking exemption for disabled veterans
Title
Provides relative to proof of disability requirements for an airport parking exemption for disabled veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 140 FINAL PASSAGE (#42) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/2024. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |