LA HB138 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for restitution and disgorgement of profits (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for restitution and disgorgement of profits (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 138, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1643) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 138, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1634) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 138, FINAL PASSAGE (#1454) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 138, CO-AUTHORS (#1453) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 138, FINAL PASSAGE (#416) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 138, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1634) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 138, FINAL PASSAGE (#1454) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 138, CO-AUTHORS (#1453) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 138, FINAL PASSAGE (#416) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 811. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Notice the House reconsidered rejection of the Senate amendments and concurred in the Senate amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-16 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-06-16 | Reconsidered. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2010-06-16 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-10 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-09 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-08 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-27 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2010-04-27 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 27, 2010. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-20 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-04 | Prefiled. |