LA HB137 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Children's Cabinet Advisory Board
Title
Provides relative to the Children's Cabinet Advisory Board
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Brass [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House Vote on HB 137 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 104, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/26/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |