LA HB135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes dispensing of medical marijuana to certain qualifying patients who are not Louisiana residents
Title
Authorizes dispensing of medical marijuana to certain qualifying patients who are not Louisiana residents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 135 FINAL PASSAGE (#1275) (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 135 FINAL PASSAGE (#498) (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 135 FINAL PASSAGE (#498) (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 438. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2022. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-02-25 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. |
2022-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |