LA HB132 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-01 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-01 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies postaccident drug testing requirements
Title
Modifies postaccident drug testing requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#172) (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19. |
2019-04-29 | House | Notice given. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19. |
2019-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |