LA HB132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies postaccident drug testing requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies postaccident drug testing requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#172) (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-05-07SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-06HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-06HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
2019-04-29HouseNotice given.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-23HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB132&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117761
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126653
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131620
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126105
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126377
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127294
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131300
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131390
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131463
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117769
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126821
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131686
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131498

Bill Comments

feedback