LA HB1307 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a public comment period at a public meeting at any point prior to a vote on an agenda item"
Title
Requires a public comment period at a public meeting at any point prior to a vote on an agenda item"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1307, FINAL PASSAGE (#1748) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1307, FINAL PASSAGE (#674) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1307, FINAL PASSAGE (#674) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 850. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-07 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 7, 2010. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title. |