LA HB1246 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date: January 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date: January 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to contracts with dental providers
Title
Provides relative to contracts with dental providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 1246, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1869) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1246, FINAL PASSAGE (#1743) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1246, FINAL PASSAGE (#978) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1246, FINAL PASSAGE (#1743) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1246, FINAL PASSAGE (#978) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Effective date: January 1, 2011. | |
2010-07-02 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 940. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-20 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-18 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-10 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-26 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-05-25 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-24 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-24 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 24, 2010. | |
2010-05-17 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-12 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010. | |
2010-05-12 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-10 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 10, 2010. | |
2010-05-03 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | Reported with amendments (7-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-31 | Read by title. |