LA HB119 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date: 03/10/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date: 03/10/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces appropriations for the legislature for Fiscal Year 2015-2016 (Item #1)
Title
Reduces appropriations for the legislature for Fiscal Year 2015-2016 (Item #1)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote on HB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#49) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote on HB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#49) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Effective date: 03/10/2016. |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 20. |
2016-03-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-06 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-02-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016. |
2016-02-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-02-25 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2016-02-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |