LA HB118 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to enforcement of federal firearm laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to enforcement of federal firearm laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 118 FINAL PASSAGE (#205) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2021-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseReported with amendments (8-4-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-19HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
2021-03-15HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-15HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB118&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1203931
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218703
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220785
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217421
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218506
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218437
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220641
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1203944
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218802
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220947
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220766

Bill Comments

feedback