LA HB116 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the exclusion of advertising expenses in setting rates or making rate filings
Title
Provides for the exclusion of advertising expenses in setting rates or making rate filings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-02-25 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. |
2022-02-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-02-21 | House | Prefiled. |