LA HB1140 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renames a portion of Louisiana Highway 3179 in St. John Parish as "Martin Luther King, Jr. Boulevard"
Title
Renames a portion of Louisiana Highway 3179 in St. John Parish as "Martin Luther King, Jr. Boulevard"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1140 ADOPT (#1715) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 1140 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1593) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 1140 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1296) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1140 FINAL PASSAGE (#1351) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 1140 FINAL PASSAGE (#537) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 1140 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1593) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 1140 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1296) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1140 FINAL PASSAGE (#1351) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 1140 FINAL PASSAGE (#537) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2014. |
2014-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 841. |
2014-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/3/2014. |
2014-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2014-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2014-05-30 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2014-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Adley, Brown, and Gary Smith. |
2014-05-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Gaines, St. Germain, and Price. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2014-05-28 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2014-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014. |
2014-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2014. |
2014-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2014-04-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title. |