LA HB112 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the official journals of municipalities
Title
Provides relative to the official journals of municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-02-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/19/2016. |
2016-02-16 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-02-16 | House | Prefiled. |