LA HB112 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the crime of interfering with a law enforcement investigation (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the crime of interfering with a law enforcement investigation (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 112, FINAL PASSAGE (#1342) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 112, FINAL PASSAGE (#315) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 112, FINAL PASSAGE (#315) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 349. | |
2010-06-14 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-10 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-02 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-22 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2010-04-21 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-21 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 21, 2010. | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-04 | Prefiled. |