LA HB109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the ancillary expenses of state government
Title
Provides for the ancillary expenses of state government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 109 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#811) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 109 FINAL PASSAGE (#638) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 109 FINAL PASSAGE (#241) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 109 FINAL PASSAGE (#638) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 109 FINAL PASSAGE (#241) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 40. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/02/19. |
2019-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 4 for 05/30. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 2 for 05/09/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. |
2019-03-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-03-21 | House | Prefiled. |