LA HB108 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the installation and use of newborn safety devices at infant relinquishment sites designated in the Safe Haven Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the installation and use of newborn safety devices at infant relinquishment sites designated in the Safe Haven Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 108 FINAL PASSAGE (#415) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback