LA HB1067 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for reimbursement for processing waste tires
Title
Provides for reimbursement for processing waste tires
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 1067, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1370) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1067, FINAL PASSAGE (#1393) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 1067, FINAL PASSAGE (#700) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1067, FINAL PASSAGE (#1393) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 1067, FINAL PASSAGE (#700) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-06-13 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 817. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for concurrence on 5/31/2012. | |
2012-05-24 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-24 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-22 | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. | |
2012-05-07 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-07 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-26 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2012. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported with amendments (14-0-1) (Regular). | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2012-04-02 | Read by title. |