LA HB1 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 15 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Signed by the President of the Senate on 10/16/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to parole eligibility for certain juvenile offenders (Item #58)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to parole eligibility for certain juvenile offenders (Item #58)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#110) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#17) (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#17) (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 10/16/2020.
2020-10-16HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-10-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-14HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-10-14SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-13SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-13SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-10-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseReported with amendments (8-1).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-09-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-09-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback