KY SR94 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - adopted 33-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - adopted 33-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm the appointment of Samuel J. Bach as an adminstrative law judge in the Department of Workers' Claims for a term expiring December 31, 2025.
Title
A RESOLUTION confirming the appointment of Samuel J. Bach as an administrative law judge in the Department of Workers' Claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adopt RSN# 2017 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | adopted 33-0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2022 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-02-03 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |