KY SR55 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize February 13, 2019 as Children's Advocacy Day.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring the Blueprint for Kentucky’s Children and adjourning in honor of Children's Advocacy Day, February 13, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2019-02-07 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2019-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sr55.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sr55/orig_bill.pdf |