KY SR252 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - passed 38-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - passed 38-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm the reappointment of M. Melissa Chandler to the Parole Board for a term expiring on June 30, 2022.
Title
A RESOLUTION confirming the reappointment of M. Melissa Chandler to the Parole Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | passed 38-0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sr252.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sr252/orig_bill.pdf |