KY SR163 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaim March 28, 2024, to be The Garden Club of Frankfort Day in recognition of its 100th anniversary.
Title
A RESOLUTION proclaiming March 28, 2024, as The Garden Club of Frankfort Day on its 100th anniversary.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2024-02-22 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2024-02-20 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/sr163.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/sr163/orig_bill.pdf |