KY SJR149 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Energy and Environment Cabinet to provide guidance and consult with entities that discharge into the waters of the Commonwealth on the best management practice for perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS).
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing the Energy and Environment Cabinet to provide guidance and consultation on best management practices for perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) to entities that discharge directly or indirectly into Kentucky's waterways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 403 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 2953 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 2953 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2024-03-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-13 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | received in House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 38-0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 04, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |