KY SJR1 | 2021 | 1st Special Sesison

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expire or extend certain executive orders, including emergency executive orders, administrative orders, administrative regulations, or other administrative actions, relating to COVID-19 and declare that the extended orders expire until January 15, 2022; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A JOINT RESOLUTION extending emergency executive actions and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2021-09-08Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2021-09-07Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed
2021-09-07Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2021-09-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, September 7, 2021
2021-09-07Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2021-09-07Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2021-09-07Senate1st reading
2021-09-07Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2021-09-07Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2021-09-07Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-09-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback