KY SCR36 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-11 - to Senate Floor
Pending: Senate Floor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-11 - to Senate Floor
Pending: Senate Floor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that when the Senate and the House of Representatives adjourn on January 11, 2019, they adjourn until February 5, 2019, when the second part of the 2019 Regular Session shall convene.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION adjourning the 2019 Regular Session of the General Assembly until February 5, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2019-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/scr36.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/scr36/orig_bill.pdf |