KY SB98 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-26 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-26 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.212 to establish new amounts in the child support guidelines table and delete the old amounts.
Title
AN ACT relating to child support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2015-02-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB98.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB98/bill.doc |