KY SB96 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 189 to allow a local government to issue permits for racing events; and set forth the requirements for permits and operation of a racing event.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2780 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 367 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2606 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 367 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2606 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 183) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | passed 36-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-30 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-30 | House | taken from Rules |
2023-03-30 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-16 | House | returned to Transportation (H) |
2023-03-16 | House | 2nd reading |
2023-03-16 | House | taken from Transportation (H) |
2023-03-15 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2023-03-15 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-15 | House | 1st reading |
2023-03-15 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-15 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-15 | House | received in House |
2023-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |