KY SB93 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - returned to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - returned to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 261.240 to clarify language that concern reporting requirements of livestock received and sold at stockyards.
Title
AN ACT relating to agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | returned to Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-15 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-15 | taken from Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-14 | returned to Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-14 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-14 | taken from Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-03 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-01 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB93.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB93/bill.doc |