KY SB90 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 344 to define terms; prohibit discrimination against medical care providers who decline to perform procedures that violate their conscience; grant providers the right not to participate in or pay for services that violate their conscience; exempt providers from liability for exerciseing these rights; establish a civil cause of action for persons injured by violations of these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT protecting the exercise of medical ethics and diversity within the medical profession.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Senaterecommitted to Judiciary (S)
2020-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-11Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-10Senatefloor amendment (6) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-10Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-09Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-06Senatefloor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed to bill, and floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-05Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 9, 2020
2020-03-03Senatefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-24Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-16Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-01-14Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback