KY SB84 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 104)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 104)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 314 to define "APRN-designated certified nurse midwife," "certified professional midwifery services," "council," "licensed certified professional midwife; "create the Licensed Certified Professional Midwives Advisory Council under the Board of Nursing and establish its membership; provide that a licensed certified professional midwife has same authority and responsibility as other licensed health care providers regarding public health laws and require each to keep appropriate medical records; require the board to promulgate administrative regulations relating to licensed certified professional midwives, including a requirement for informed consent, fees for permits, statewide requirements for transfer of care, medical tests, and a formulary of medications; permit the board to require a criminal background investigation of an applicant for a license as a licensed certified professional midwife by means of a fingerprint check; require the council to delineate findings on restrictions to providing certified professional midwifery services; provide immunity from liability in civil action for health care providers who have acted in consultation with a licensed certified professional midwife; establish a work group to develop statewide transfer guidelines; amend KRS 164.298, 211.180, 311.271, and 311.550 to conform; require data to be collected about the place of delivery and planned place of delivery; prohibit performing abortions; provide an education requirement to meet United States educational accreditation standards; provide that any medications used by a licensed certified professional midwife are for the safe conduct of pregnancy, labor and birth, and immediate care of a newborn.
Title
AN ACT relating to licensed certified professional midwives.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Perry Clark [D] | Sen. David Givens [R] |
Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. Reginald Thomas [D] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 983 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 306 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 833 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 306 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 833 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 104) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Bill passed 35-1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) on Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2019-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2019-03-12 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-04 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-02-22 | House | received in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-21 | Senate | passed 32-4 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) ruled out of order |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-01-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Background Checks
Boards and Commissions
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Women
Background Checks
Boards and Commissions
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Women