KY SB8 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 311.710 to 311.820 to require an ultrasound prior to an abortion; amend KRS 311.990 to provide a criminal penalty.
Title
AN ACT relating to full disclosure in public safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. Joe Bowen [R] | Sen. David Givens [R] |
Sen. Sara Gregory [R] | Sen. Christian McDaniel [R] | Sen. John Schickel [R] | Sen. Dan Seum [R] |
Sen. Damon Thayer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-13 | House | discharge petition filed |
2014-02-11 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | received in House |
2014-02-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-5 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 5, 2014 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-30 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-13 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |