KY SB70 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - 3rd reading, passed 36-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend sections of KRS 309.325 to 309.339 to change the terminology from "licensed diabetes educators" to "licensed diabetes care and education specialists," and to incorporate changes to the titles of national organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to licensed diabetes educators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1588 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2021-02-25Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021
2021-02-24Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-23Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2021-02-02Senateto Licensing & Occupations (S)
2021-01-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback