KY SB7 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 075)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 075)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 336.700 to allow arbitration, mediation, or alternative dispute resolution agreements to be required by employers as a condition or precondition to employment; allow a waiver of a claim to be required as a condition or precondition for rehiring of an employee; allow an agreement to reduce the period for limitations as a condition or precondition of employment as long as the agreement does not apply to state or federal law that preempts modifying limitations; allow an employee to be required to agree to a background check as a condition or precondition of employment in conformity with a state of federal law requiring background checks; state that these provisions shall be applied retroactively and prospectively; amend KRS 417.050 to comform; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 975 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 280 (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Adopt HFA 2 RCS# 279 (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 834 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 280 (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Adopt HFA 2 RCS# 279 (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 834 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 075) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Bill passed 25-11 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (3) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (3) on Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | passed 51-45 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (3) |
2019-03-12 | House | floor amendment (2) defeated |
2019-03-12 | House | 3rd reading |
2019-03-06 | House | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-04 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-03-01 | House | reassigned to State Government (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2019-02-22 | House | received in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 26-10 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |