KY SB7 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 527.020 to allow persons not otherwise prohibited by other laws to carry concealed weapons without a license, excluding certain prohibited locations; specify that businesses and health facilities may prohibit concealed weapons by posting notice, with exceptions for some vehicles; amend KRS 237.115 to conform; repeal KRS 403.754.
Title
AN ACT relating to firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Albert Robinson [R] | Sen. Ralph Alvarado [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] |
Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. Ray Jones [D] | Sen. Stephen Meredith [R] | Sen. John Schickel [R] |
Sen. Dan Seum [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Robin Webb [D] | Sen. Steve West [R] |
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-01-04 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-01-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-01-04 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-01-03 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |