KY SB68 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 403 to clarify that a victim of domestic violence is not required to pay the legal fees of the abusive spouse in a divorce action when the spouse is incarcerated for crimes against the petitioner.
Title
AN ACT relating to dissolution of marriage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 296 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 405 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 405 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 405 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 405 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-0 |
2018-03-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-05 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-02-01 | House | received in House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 31, 2018 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-08 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |